OK SB1399 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State property; creating the Oklahoma Capital Assets Maintenance and Protection Act; creating the Capital Assets Maintenance and Protection Fund; creating Board. Effective date.
Title
State property; creating the Oklahoma Capital Assets Maintenance and Protection Act; creating the Capital Assets Maintenance and Protection Fund; creating Board. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: : DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | HAs read |
2024-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 17 |
2024-04-22 | House | Amended |
2024-04-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck |
2024-04-22 | House | General Order |
2024-04-11 | House | Emergency removed |
2024-04-11 | House | Title restored |
2024-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Remove as principal author Representative Wallace and substitute with Representative McBride |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hall |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |