OK SB1341 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Health Services and Long-Term Care, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-06 - Withdrawn from Health Services and Long-Term Care, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy; providing for substitution of biological product under certain conditions; requiring certain communication. Effective date.
Title
Pharmacy; providing for substitution of biological product under certain conditions; requiring certain communication. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | House | Withdrawn from Health Services and Long-Term Care, Direct to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2020-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |