OK SB1325 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water and water rights; transferring authority of Water Quality Standards to Department of Environmental Quality. Effective date.
Title
Water and water rights; transferring authority of Water Quality Standards to Department of Environmental Quality. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/03/2022 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-02 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-28 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 23 |
2022-04-28 | House | General Order |
2022-04-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2022-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |