OK SB1305 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemptions for government or nonprofit entities; disaster recovery. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemptions for government or nonprofit entities; disaster recovery. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Rep. Nicole Miller [R] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] | Rep. Melissa Provenzano [D] |
Rep. Trish Ranson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 1 |
2022-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-05-20 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2022-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-11 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2022-05-11 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2022-05-09 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2022-05-02 | Senate | HAs read |
2022-05-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Amended |
2022-04-27 | House | House Rule suspended |
2022-04-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, Provenzano, Ranson |
2022-04-27 | House | General Order |
2022-04-11 | House | Emergency added |
2022-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-03-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-03-30 | House | Remove Representative Pfeiffer as principal House author and substitute with Representative Miller |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Rader |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |