OK SB1246 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Workers' compensation fraud; requiring stay of certain proceeding. Effective date.
Title
Workers' compensation fraud; requiring stay of certain proceeding. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Approved by Governor 05/15/2012 | |
2012-05-09 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-09 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-09 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-08 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-08 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-24 | HAs read | |
2012-04-24 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-23 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sanders | |
2012-04-23 | General Order | |
2012-04-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-03-15 | First Reading | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-14 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6 | |
2012-03-14 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-28 | coauthored by Jordan (principal House author) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-28 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Bingman | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |