OK SB1183 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Personnel Act; allowing certain authorities to grant sick leave with pay under certain circumstances. Emergency.
Title
Oklahoma Personnel Act; allowing certain authorities to grant sick leave with pay under certain circumstances. Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from General Government committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stanley |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |