OK SB1111 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Vetoed 05/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Vetoed 05/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; enacting the Pension Improvement Act; creating the Oklahoma Pension Improvement Revolving Fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Public finance; enacting the Pension Improvement Act; creating the Oklahoma Pension Improvement Revolving Fund. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Anderson [R] | Rep. Todd Thomsen [R] | Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Rep. Mark McCullough [R] |
Rep. Randy McDaniel [R] | Sen. Jerry Ellis [D] | Rep. Arthur Hulbert [R] | Rep. Katie Henke [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | Vetoed 05/06/2013 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Veto message read |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-30 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-04-01 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 7 |
2013-03-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Banz, Hulbert, McCullough |
2013-03-28 | House | General Order |
2013-03-25 | House | Title restored |
2013-03-25 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Ellis |
2013-03-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Randy), Henke |
2013-03-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Pensions committee; CR filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Thomsen (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Pensions |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Anderson |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |