OK SB1107 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
Pending: House County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
Pending: House County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; modifying procedure for municipalities to recover certain costs. Effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; modifying procedure for municipalities to recover certain costs. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2018-03-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Ownbey (principal House author) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 22 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 22 | 112 | New Code | See Bill Text |