OK HR1034 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 39-4)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 39-4)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; proclaiming May 6 through May 12, 2020, as Nurses Week.
Title
Professions and occupations; proclaiming May 6 through May 12, 2020, as Nurses Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Marilyn Stark [R] | Rep. Ken Luttrell [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] |
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Rep. John Pfeiffer [R] |
Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R] | Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Rep. Marcus McEntire [R] |
Rep. Carl Newton [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] | Rep. Tammy West [R] | Rep. Rande Worthen [R] |
Sen. Zack Taylor [R] | Rep. Kelly Albright [D] | Rep. Trey Caldwell [R] | Rep. Rusty Cornwell [R] |
Rep. Denise Hader [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] | Rep. Sheila Dills [R] | Rep. Derrel Fincher [R] |
Rep. Andy Fugate [D] | Rep. Jim Grego [R] | Rep. David Hardin [R] | Rep. Ronny Johns [R] |
Rep. Robert Manger [R] | Rep. Thomas Marti [R] | Rep. Stan May [R] | Rep. Garry Mize [R] |
Rep. Jim Olsen [R] | Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Rep. Kenton Patzkowsky [R] | Rep. Melissa Provenzano [D] |
Rep. Trish Ranson [D] | Rep. Cynthia Roe [R] | Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] | Rep. Chris Sneed [R] |
Rep. John Talley [R] | Rep. Mark Vancuren [R] | Rep. Brad Boles [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2020-05-06 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2020-05-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate, Fincher, Manger, Grego, Worthen, Patzkowsky, Sims, Dills, Taylor, Newton, CrosswhiteHader, Mize, Sneed, Cornwell, West (Kevin), Provenzano, Russ, Nollan, Lepak, Caldwell (Trey), Talley, Hardin (David), McEntire, Bush, Roberts (Sean), Ranson, Boles, Fetgatter, Davis, Marti, Pfeiffer, Luttrell, Johns, Pae, Frix, Vancuren, West (Tammy), Roberts (Dustin), Albright, May, Olsen |
2020-05-06 | House | Considered |
2020-05-05 | House | Authored by Representative Stark, Roe |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced |