OK HR1025 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 70-31)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 70-31)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Proclaiming April 30, 2011, Kelsey Briggs Day.
Title
Proclaiming April 30, 2011, Kelsey Briggs Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-21 | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State | |
2011-04-20 | Adopted, referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-20 | Coauthored by all other Representatives | |
2011-04-20 | Considered | |
2011-04-06 | Authored by Representative Nelson | |
2011-04-06 | Introduced |
Subjects
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hr1025&Session=1100 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/2011-12bills/HB/hr1025_enr.rtf |