OK HR1009 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 50-4)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Resolution; proclaiming April 2, 2019 as Oklahoma Agriculture Day; distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolution; proclaiming April 2, 2019 as Oklahoma Agriculture Day; distribution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseEnrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
2019-04-02HouseAdopted, referred for enrollment
2019-04-02HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), Taylor, Pfeiffer, Nichols, Lawson, Patzkowsky, Hilbert, Roberts (Sean), Bush, Ranson, McEntire, Hasenbeck, Tadlock, Miller, Townley, Sanders, Johns, Wallace, Sterling, May, Conley, Martinez, Osburn, Lepak, Mize, Russ, Hardin (David), McCall, Talley, Sims, Manger, Gann, Steagall, Humphrey, O'Donnell, Hill, Sneed, Caldwell (Trey), Davis, Newton, Olsen, Kiger, Phillips, Strom, Randleman, Boles, Smith, Cornwell, Roe, Loring, West (Kevin), Stark, CrosswhiteHader
2019-04-02HouseConsidered
2019-04-01HouseAuthored by Representative Kerbs
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback