US SB3857 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-18 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-18 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to take certain land in the State of California into trust for the benefit of the Jamul Indian Village of California, and for other purposes.
Title
Jamul Indian Village Land Transfer Act
Sponsors
Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Laphonza Butler [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-18 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2024-07-10 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6443 (Same As) 2024-04-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/3857/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s3857/BILLS-118s3857is.pdf |