US HB6443 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To take certain land in the State of California into trust for the benefit of the Jamul Indian Village of California Tribe, and for other purposes.
Title
Jamul Indian Village Land Transfer Act
Sponsors
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2024-04-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-04-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. |
2024-04-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 6443. |
2024-04-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2024-04-09 | House | Ms. Hageman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2024-04-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 364. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-440. |
2024-01-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-01-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs Discharged |
2023-12-05 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-11-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs. |
2023-11-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-11-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3857 (Same As) 2024-02-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.