OK HR1009 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR1009
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 50-4)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 50-4)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution; proclaiming April 2, 2019 as Oklahoma Agriculture Day; distribution.
Title
Resolution; proclaiming April 2, 2019 as Oklahoma Agriculture Day; distribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State |
2019-04-02 | House | Adopted, referred for enrollment |
2019-04-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), Taylor, Pfeiffer, Nichols, Lawson, Patzkowsky, Hilbert, Roberts (Sean), Bush, Ranson, McEntire, Hasenbeck, Tadlock, Miller, Townley, Sanders, Johns, Wallace, Sterling, May, Conley, Martinez, Osburn, Lepak, Mize, Russ, Hardin (David), McCall, Talley, Sims, Manger, Gann, Steagall, Humphrey, O'Donnell, Hill, Sneed, Caldwell (Trey), Davis, Newton, Olsen, Kiger, Phillips, Strom, Randleman, Boles, Smith, Cornwell, Roe, Loring, West (Kevin), Stark, CrosswhiteHader |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered |
2019-04-01 | House | Authored by Representative Kerbs |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
HR1009 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Enrolled, signed, filed with Secretary of State