OK HB4369 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; allowing felony probationers and parolees the ability to earn discharge credits under certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; allowing felony probationers and parolees the ability to earn discharge credits under certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Rep. John Waldron [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2022 |
2022-05-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-10 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 8 |
2022-05-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron |
2022-05-10 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 7 |
2022-03-23 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-23 | House | Amended |
2022-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to Rules |
2022-03-02 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2022-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |