OK HB4106 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-18 - Approved by Governor 05/18/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-18 - Approved by Governor 05/18/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring school districts to maintain protocol for responding to students in mental health crisis; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; requiring school districts to maintain protocol for responding to students in mental health crisis; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Vancuren [R] | Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R] | Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Sen. Julia Kirt [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | House | Approved by Governor 05/18/2022 |
2022-05-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-12 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-12 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 4 |
2022-05-12 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-05-02 | House | SA's received |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Frix |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kirt |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 3 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-28 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2022-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1 |
2022-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson |
2022-03-09 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Vancuren |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |