OK HB3887 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; enacting the Oklahoma Remote Quality Jobs Incentive Act; incentive payments; procedures; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; enacting the Oklahoma Remote Quality Jobs Incentive Act; incentive payments; procedures; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Business and Commerce committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |