OK HB3873 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Marriage; eligibility to marry; eliminating exceptions to age requirement; marriage licenses; effective date.
Title
Marriage; eligibility to marry; eliminating exceptions to age requirement; marriage licenses; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 71 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 71 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 16 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | House Rule suspended |
2020-03-11 | House | Adoption of amendment rescinded |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, advancement rescinded, returned to General Order |
2020-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter |
2020-03-11 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 71 Nays: 10 |
2020-03-09 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Dunnington |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 60 |
2020-03-09 | House | Amended |
2020-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Brewer |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Dunnington |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |