OK HB3481 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy management consultants; defining terms; payments and reimbursements; mail order pharmacies; performance standards; effective date.
Title
Pharmacy management consultants; defining terms; payments and reimbursements; mail order pharmacies; performance standards; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus McEntire [R] | Sen. Greg McCortney [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Avery Frix [R] |
Rep. Chris Sneed [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), Frix, Sneed |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |