OK HB3451 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health; definitions; effective date.
Title
Mental health; definitions; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Boatman [R] | Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Jared Deck [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | House | Approved by Governor 04/23/2024 |
2024-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 5 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 |
2024-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck |
2024-03-11 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Boatman |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |