OK HB3345 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Missing and murdered indigenous persons; creating Ida's Law; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Missing and murdered indigenous persons; creating Ida's Law; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2020-03-05SenateCoauthored by Senator Hicks
2020-03-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Hall
2020-03-04SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-03HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-03HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 4
2020-03-03HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Montgomery
2020-03-03HouseRemove Senator Montgomery as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Rosino
2020-03-03HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell, Phillips, Pae, Roberts (Sean), Branham, Perryman
2020-03-03HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-26HouseAuthored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
2020-02-26HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Walke, Wright, Dunnington, Blancett, Albright, Ranson, Russ
2020-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Dollens
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback