OK HB3294 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; relating to investigation procedures of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; authorizing use of records under certain circumstances. Emergency.
Title
State government; relating to investigation procedures of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation; authorizing use of records under certain circumstances. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - House - House: (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-06 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-05 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-05 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-07 | SA's received | |
2010-04-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 | |
2010-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan | |
2010-03-01 | General Order | |
2010-02-18 | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-18 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Tibbs | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |