OK HB3291 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State employee benefits; Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act; modifying definition; Public Employees Retirement System; definition; service credit; benefit computations; contracts; effective dates.
Title
State employee benefits; Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act; modifying definition; Public Employees Retirement System; definition; service credit; benefit computations; contracts; effective dates.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hardin [R] | Sen. Tom Woods [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2024-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-11 | House | General Order |
2024-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Woods (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert |
2024-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Remove Representative Hilbert as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hardin |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2024-02-21 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-20 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Hilbert |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |