OK HB3249 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Vaccination exemptions; Oklahoma Child Care Facilities Licensing Act; immunization exemptions; effective date.
Title
Vaccination exemptions; Oklahoma Child Care Facilities Licensing Act; immunization exemptions; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Olsen [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 15 |
2024-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Olsen |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |