OK HB3106 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Conservation; Terry Peach North Canadian Watershed Restoration Act; modifying name; pilot program to remove harmful woody species; modifying name; fund; effective date.
Title
Conservation; Terry Peach North Canadian Watershed Restoration Act; modifying name; pilot program to remove harmful woody species; modifying name; fund; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2024-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-05 | House | Title stricken |
2024-03-05 | House | Amended |
2024-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Alonso-Sandoval |
2024-03-05 | House | General Order |
2024-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Archer |
2024-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture Committee |
2024-02-12 | House | Referred to Agriculture |
2024-02-12 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Dobrinski |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |