OK HB3023 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation; Office of Mobility and Public Transit; modifying date for plan submission; emergency.
Title
Transportation; Office of Mobility and Public Transit; modifying date for plan submission; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Bush |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |