OK HB3017 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; counseling for state employees for certain events; directing Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services to promulgate rules; effective date; emergency.
Title
State government; counseling for state employees for certain events; directing Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services to promulgate rules; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/24/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-06 | House | General Order |
2018-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Faught |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |