OK HB3000 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Driving under the influence; Impaired Driving Prevention Advisory Committee; membership; driver license revocation; ignition interlock devices; Board of Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence; effective date.
Title
Driving under the influence; Impaired Driving Prevention Advisory Committee; membership; driver license revocation; ignition interlock devices; Board of Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Rande Worthen [R] | Sen. Tom Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | Approved by Governor 05/03/2024 |
2024-05-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-05-01 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-30 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-30 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-30 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2024-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2024-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2024-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-07 | House | Title restored |
2024-03-07 | House | Amended |
2024-03-07 | House | House Rule suspended |
2024-03-07 | House | Considered |
2024-03-07 | House | Laid over |
2024-03-07 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Title stricken |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Woods (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Public Safety Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Worthen |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |