OK HB2991 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement; Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System; reference; revisions; emergency.
Title
Retirement; Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System; reference; revisions; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2024 |
2024-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Munson |
2024-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-06 | House | General Order |
2024-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative West (Josh) |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |