OK HB2976 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-07 - Ayes: 38 Nays: 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-07 - Ayes: 38 Nays: 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; requiring hospitals to provide parents of newborn infants certain educational information; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; requiring hospitals to provide parents of newborn infants certain educational information; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | House | Ayes: 38 Nays: 36 |
2014-05-07 | House | Motion to override veto tabled |
2014-04-29 | House | Vetoed 04/29/2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2014-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2014-03-03 | House | General Order |
2014-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Schwartz |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |