OK HB2898 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2898
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-21 - Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
Pending: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-21 - Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
Pending: Joint Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; Public Finance Act of 2023; effective date.
Title
Public finance; Public Finance Act of 2023; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Sen. Roger Thompson [R] | Rep. Ryan Martinez [R] | Sen. Chuck Hall [R] |
Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R] | Rep. Ken Luttrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-21 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace, Martinez |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2898 (Carry Over) 2023-02-21 - Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget