OK HB2857 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; Oklahoma State Government Debt Transparency and Online Checkbook One Stop Initiative; website; definition; effective date.
Title
Public finance; Oklahoma State Government Debt Transparency and Online Checkbook One Stop Initiative; website; definition; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-07 | First Reading | |
2012-03-07 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-06 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 21 | |
2012-03-06 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman | |
2012-03-06 | General Order | |
2012-02-13 | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-13 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Hall | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |