OK HB2826 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset; Polygraph Examiners Board; re-creating the Board; modifying termination date.
Title
Sunset; Polygraph Examiners Board; re-creating the Board; modifying termination date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Business and Commerce committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 13 |
2020-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-18 | House | General Order |
2020-02-06 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Gann |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |