OK HB2826 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Marriage; prohibiting the use of ex parte orders to remove certain children from domestic violence shelters. Effective date.
Title
Marriage; prohibiting the use of ex parte orders to remove certain children from domestic violence shelters. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - House - House: (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-04 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-13 | SA's received | |
2010-04-13 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-12 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-12 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-04-05 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-23 | First Reading | |
2010-02-23 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-22 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-22 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-22 | General Order | |
2010-02-16 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Peters | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 104 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |