OK HB2774 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; Clean Air in Restaurants Act; rebate program for restaurants; Oklahoma Certified Healthy Communities Act; Oklahoma Healthy Communities Advisory Committee; Oklahoma Certified Healthy Schools Act; Oklahoma Healthy Schools Advisory Committee. Effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; Clean Air in Restaurants Act; rebate program for restaurants; Oklahoma Certified Healthy Communities Act; Oklahoma Healthy Communities Advisory Committee; Oklahoma Certified Healthy Schools Act; Oklahoma Healthy Schools Advisory Committee. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Approved by Governor 05/07/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 23 | |
2010-05-04 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Morrissette | |
2010-05-04 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-21 | SA's received | |
2010-04-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8 | |
2010-04-20 | coauthored by Myers | |
2010-04-20 | Title restored | |
2010-04-20 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-04-06 | coauthored by Easley, Leftwich | |
2010-04-06 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-04-05 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-04-05 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Leftwich, Easley | |
2010-03-24 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 10 | |
2010-03-09 | Title restored | |
2010-03-09 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Jackson, Cox, Pittman, Shelton, McAffrey, Shumate, Walker | |
2010-03-09 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Withdrawn from Public Health Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Steele | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 1515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 2061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |