OK HB2695 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; allowing certain assisted living facilities to use alternate fire sprinkler protection. Effective date.
Title
State government; allowing certain assisted living facilities to use alternate fire sprinkler protection. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - House - House: (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-04 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-20 | SA's received | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 10 | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2010-04-19 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety and Homeland Security committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2010-03-29 | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 23 | |
2010-03-11 | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Smithson | |
2010-03-11 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to Public Safety Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Withdrawn from Public Health Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Tibbs | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |