OK HB2665 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2665
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; fees; modifying name of certain license; adding certain license information; effective date; emergency.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; fees; modifying name of certain license; adding certain license information; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Bill Coleman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/23/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 6 |
2021-03-09 | House | General Order |
2021-02-22 | House | Emergency added |
2021-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2665 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2021