OK HB2654 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Referred to Judiciary - Criminal
Pending: House Judiciary - Criminal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; directing peace officer to contact domestic violence intervention program for victim under certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; directing peace officer to contact domestic violence intervention program for victim under certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2021-02-09 | House | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2021-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2654 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Referred to Judiciary - Criminal