OK HB2652 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Workers' Compensation Court; relating to membership and terms of Workers' Compensation Court Judges; providing for permanent assignment of certain positions; modifying expiration dates of certain terms; requiring legislative approval for the closure of certain court. Effective date.
Title
Workers' Compensation Court; relating to membership and terms of Workers' Compensation Court Judges; providing for permanent assignment of certain positions; modifying expiration dates of certain terms; requiring legislative approval for the closure of certain court. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 16 | |
2010-05-27 | coauthored by Branan | |
2010-05-27 | 3 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-27 | 3 CCR read | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 31 | |
2010-05-27 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs, Derby, Faught | |
2010-05-27 | 3 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-26 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Coates | |
2010-05-26 | 3 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-26 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-26 | 2 CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-26 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-19 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-17 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-11 | Enacting clause restored | |
2010-05-11 | Title restored | |
2010-05-11 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-04 | HC's named: Sullivan, McDaniel (Randy), McCullough, Liebmann, Carey, Lamons | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Coffee, Lamb, Coates, Laster, Burrage | |
2010-04-21 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-20 | SA's received | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 16 | |
2010-04-19 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-25 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 31 | |
2010-03-01 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-01 | Amended | |
2010-03-01 | Authored by Senator Coffee (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Duncan, Osborn | |
2010-03-01 | General Order | |
2010-02-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCullough, Moore | |
2010-02-17 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Sullivan | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
85 | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 112 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 12 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 12 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 122 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 13 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 14 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 201 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 201 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 21 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 24 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 28 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 28 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 3 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 3 | 1a | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 3 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 3 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 3 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 41 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 42 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 44 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 47 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
85 | 64 | New Code | See Bill Text |