OK HB2649 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services
Pending: Senate Appropriations Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Sub Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services
Pending: Senate Appropriations Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Sub Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; creating the Oklahoma Music Trail Act of 2010. Effective date.
Title
State government; creating the Oklahoma Music Trail Act of 2010. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: R (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: International Relations & Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: R (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: International Relations & Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services | |
2010-03-16 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 23 | |
2010-03-08 | Amended | |
2010-03-08 | House Rule suspended | |
2010-03-08 | Authored by Senator Garrison (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-08 | General Order | |
2010-02-11 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute International Relations and Tourism Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to International Relations and Tourism | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Faught | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
74 | 1891 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1891 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1891 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1891 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1891 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |