OK HB2597 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Approved by Governor 02/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Firearms; adding exception to certain prohibited act; adding condition that allows for firearms to be lawfully carried; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; adding exception to certain prohibited act; adding condition that allows for firearms to be lawfully carried; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 60 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 4 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 62 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseApproved by Governor 02/27/2019
2019-02-27HouseSent to Governor
2019-02-27SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-02-27HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-02-27HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-02-27SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-02-27SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 6
2019-02-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Silk
2019-02-27SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-27SenateCoauthored by Senator Treat
2019-02-26SenateCoauthored by Senator Allen
2019-02-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Newhouse
2019-02-20SenateReported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2019-02-20SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Hall
2019-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Hall
2019-02-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2019-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Josh)
2019-02-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2019-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 30
2019-02-13HouseAmended
2019-02-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Davis, Tadlock, Russ, Frix, Lawson, Sims, McCall, O'Donnell, Taylor, Pfeiffer, Sneed
2019-02-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-11HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Dahm
2019-02-11HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2019-02-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Moore, Humphrey, McBride, Hasenbeck, Patzkowsky, Cornwell, Hilbert
2019-02-11HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Echols, Mize, CrosswhiteHader, Townley, McDugle, Roberts (Sean), Olsen, Gann, West (Kevin), Steagall
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback