OK HB2595 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]

Summary

Agriculture; providing for certain advertising of raw milk; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; providing for certain advertising of raw milk; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-18 - House of Representatives - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2014-02-12HouseReferred to Public Health Committee
2014-02-12HouseWithdrawn from Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
2014-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2014-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Walker
2014-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
27414New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback