OK HB2556 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Emergency telephone services; modifying payment of emergency wireless telephone fee for wireless telecommunication services. Effective date.
Title
Emergency telephone services; modifying payment of emergency wireless telephone fee for wireless telecommunication services. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Bingman [R] | Sen. Jay Gumm [D] | Rep. Steve Martin [R] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - House - House: (Y: 79 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: R (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: R (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by Governor 05/03/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-27 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-27 | Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 16 | |
2010-04-27 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan | |
2010-04-27 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-08 | SA's received | |
2010-04-08 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-07 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-07 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 | |
2010-04-07 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-29 | coauthored by Gumm | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Environment committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Environment committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Environment | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading | |
2010-03-03 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 6 | |
2010-03-02 | Amended | |
2010-03-02 | House Rule suspended | |
2010-03-02 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Martin (Steve) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 2843 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 2843 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2843 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |