OK HB2545 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-13 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-13 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; requiring Oklahoma Tax Commission to compile information related to Small Business Capital Formation Incentive Act and Rural Venture Capital Formation Incentive Act. Emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; requiring Oklahoma Tax Commission to compile information related to Small Business Capital Formation Incentive Act and Rural Venture Capital Formation Incentive Act. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-13 | Title restored | |
2010-05-13 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-04 | HC's named: Wright (John), Miller, Hickman, Martin (Steve), Liebmann, Carey, Morgan, Pruett | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-29 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-06 | SA's received | |
2010-04-06 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-05 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-05 | coauthored by Garrison, Schulz | |
2010-04-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-24 | coauthored by Adelson, Gumm, Ivester | |
2010-03-24 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-23 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Ivester, Gumm, Adelson | |
2010-03-23 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 101 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-10 | Recalled from engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 101 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-09 | Emergency added | |
2010-03-09 | Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs, Reynolds, Cooksey, Kern | |
2010-03-09 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Wright (John) | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 1361 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
68 | 205 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 205 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 62 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 64 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 74 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 75 | New Code | See Bill Text |