OK HB2530 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; relating to the Elevator Safety Act; modifying exemptions. Effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; relating to the Elevator Safety Act; modifying exemptions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Mike Johnson [R] | Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Sen. Debbe Leftwich [D] |
Rep. Michael Schwartz [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-04 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox | |
2010-05-04 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-12 | SA's received | |
2010-04-12 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Labor committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Business and Labor | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading | |
2010-02-24 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 4 | |
2010-02-23 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Leftwich, Johnson (Mike) | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | General Order | |
2010-02-03 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Schwartz | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |