OK HB2330 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2330
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water; wells within municipalities; allowing municipality to drill wells on land within or outside of its corporate limits; effective date.
Title
Water; wells within municipalities; allowing municipality to drill wells on land within or outside of its corporate limits; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker |
2021-03-08 | House | General Order |
2021-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Steagall |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2330 (Carry Over) 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2021