OK HB2306 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county officers; relating to rural road improvement districts; modifying powers and duties; modifying powers of county commissioners. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Counties and county officers; relating to rural road improvement districts; modifying powers and duties; modifying powers of county commissioners. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - House - House: (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/10/2010 | |
2010-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-04 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-04 | SA's read, adopted | |
2010-04-14 | SA's received | |
2010-04-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-13 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-13 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2010-02-16 | First Reading | |
2010-02-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-15 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-15 | Authored by Senator Anderson (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-15 | General Order | |
2010-02-02 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Murphey | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 339 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 902 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |