OK HB2251 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; modifying drug-endangered children provisions; effective date.
Title
Children; modifying drug-endangered children provisions; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] |
Rep. Pam Peterson [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor 04/18/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-16 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-16 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-03-27 | coauthored by Sherrer | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2012-03-06 | First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-05 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-05 | Amended | |
2012-03-05 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2012-03-05 | General Order | |
2012-02-21 | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nollan, Kern | |
2012-02-21 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Human Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Peterson | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10A | 1 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |