OK HB2178 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2178
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; requiring disposal of certain animal carcass to be in accordance with certain recommendations; repealer; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; requiring disposal of certain animal carcass to be in accordance with certain recommendations; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Approved by Governor 05/15/2019 |
2019-05-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-09 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-08 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-08 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-07 | House | General Order |
2019-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2178 (Carry Over) 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019