OK HB2178 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2178
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Credit card transactions; allowing private schools to charge a service fee; effective date.
Title
Credit card transactions; allowing private schools to charge a service fee; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Approved by Governor 04/13/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 14 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 18 |
2017-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-07 | House | General Order |
2017-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Ortega |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2178 (Carry Over) 2017-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/13/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14A | 2 | 211 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 2 | 417 | New Code | See Bill Text |